NY A09664 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-05 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that recoupments and reductions of medical assistance payments for home care services shall not be subject to interest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that recoupments and reductions of medical assistance payments for home care services shall not be subject to interest.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-05Senatetabled
2012-10-03Senatevetoed memo.161
2012-09-21Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.240
2012-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6493B
2012-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.355
2012-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.355
2012-06-18Assemblyreported
2012-06-18Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-13Assemblyprint number 9664b
2012-06-13Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to ways and means
2012-06-11Assemblyprint number 9664a
2012-06-11Assemblyamend and recommit to ways and means
2012-04-18Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-03-23Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S06493 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9664B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09664&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09664&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09664
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09664&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09664A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09664&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09664B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09664&term=2011&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2011/A9664#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback