NY A09663 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - approval memo.25
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the Urban Development Corporation shall establish a Cyber Research Institute to perform research and development in cyber security.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that the Urban Development Corporation shall establish a Cyber Research Institute to perform research and development in cyber security.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-17Senateapproval memo.25
2012-12-17Senatesigned chap.503
2012-12-05Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-19SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-19Senate3RD READING CAL.1361
2012-06-19SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6762A
2012-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-14Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.209
2012-06-14Assemblyrules report cal.209
2012-06-14Assemblyreported
2012-06-12Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-12Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-06-06Assemblyprint number 9663a
2012-06-06Assemblyamend and recommit to economic development
2012-04-19Assemblyreference changed to economic development
2012-03-23Assemblyreferred to corporations, authorities and commissions

Same As/Similar To

S06762 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9663A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback