NY A09657 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-05 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends provisions relating to the rates of payment for the treatment and care of injured employees by two years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends provisions relating to the rates of payment for the treatment and care of injured employees by two years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-04-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-05Senatetabled
2012-10-03Senatevetoed memo.160
2012-09-21Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-05SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-05Senate3RD READING CAL.636
2012-06-05SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6806
2012-04-30SenateREFERRED TO LABOR
2012-04-30Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-04-30Assemblypassed assembly
2012-04-26Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.494
2012-04-26Assemblyreported
2012-03-22Assemblyreferred to labor

Same As/Similar To

S06806 (Same As) 2012-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9657

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback