NY A09649 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on October 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-14 - approval memo.20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Passed on October 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-14 - approval memo.20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the New York textile act to accelerate the growth of the animal and plant fiber growing, processing, and textile manufacturing industry in New York.
Title
Enacts the New York textile act to accelerate the growth of the animal and plant fiber growing, processing, and textile manufacturing industry in New York.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-14 | Assembly | approval memo.20 |
2022-10-14 | Assembly | signed chap.572 |
2022-10-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1326 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8741A |
2022-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9649a |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.353 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | rules report cal.353 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S08741 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9649A