NY A09646 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires gynecological services to be offered to incarcerated individuals with cervixes unless such individuals decline such services in writing.
Title
Requires gynecological services to be offered to incarcerated individuals with cervixes unless such individuals decline such services in writing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | print number 9646a |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to correction |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S08630 (Same As) 2022-05-16 - PRINT NUMBER 8630A