NY A09645 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Veterans, Homeland Security and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends from June 16, 2020 to June 16, 2022, revival of time barred causes of action for an injury or death caused by contact with or exposure to phenoxy herbicides for those persons serving as members of the armed forces in Indo-China from February 28, 1961 through May 7, 1975.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends from June 16, 2020 to June 16, 2022, revival of time barred causes of action for an injury or death caused by contact with or exposure to phenoxy herbicides for those persons serving as members of the armed forces in Indo-China from February 28, 1961 through May 7, 1975.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-04SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS
2020-03-04Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-03-04Assemblypassed assembly
2020-02-27Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.445
2020-02-26Assemblyreported
2020-01-29Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback