NY A09641 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-15 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the higher education services corporation to consider an applicant's change in income due to the loss of employment in determining eligibility and award amount for the tuition assistance program; provides for the repeal of such provisions on December 31, 2024.
Title
Allows the higher education services corporation to consider an applicant's change in income due to the loss of employment in determining eligibility and award amount for the tuition assistance program; provides for the repeal of such provisions on December 31, 2024.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-15 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2024-03-26 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S01220 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION