NY A09639 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - SIGNED CHAP.301
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - SIGNED CHAP.301
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Albion, Orleans county, as the "Charles W. Howard Memorial Highway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Albion, Orleans county, as the "Charles W. Howard Memorial Highway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.301 |
2020-11-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-07-23 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-07-23 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-07-23 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.322 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | substituted for a9639 |
2020-07-23 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1013 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | substituted by s7565 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.322 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | rules report cal.322 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-29 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07565 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - SIGNED CHAP.301