NY A09621 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - print number 9621a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - print number 9621a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends from November 30, 2020 to November 30, 2023, the authorization granted to the county of Broome to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Title
Extends from November 30, 2020 to November 30, 2023, the authorization granted to the county of Broome to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Assembly | print number 9621a |
2020-03-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07560 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - PRINT NUMBER 7560A