NY A09617 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s5369a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - substituted by s5369a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to repossession of a motor vehicle or motorcycle; extends the time frame in which the repossessor of a motor vehicle must submit the license plates to the department of motor vehicles from 24 hours to 10 days.
Title
Relates to repossession of a motor vehicle or motorcycle; extends the time frame in which the repossessor of a motor vehicle must submit the license plates to the department of motor vehicles from 24 hours to 10 days.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s5369a |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.328 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | print number 9617a |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2018-01-26 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S05369 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.473