NY A09600 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the imposition of an occupancy tax in the city of Yonkers.
Title
Extends the imposition of an occupancy tax in the city of Yonkers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | print number 9600a |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2018-01-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07419 (Same As) 2018-07-09 - SIGNED CHAP.112