NY A09599 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-08 - print number 9599b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-08 - print number 9599b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an educational program related to the prevention of anti-Semitism, Islamophobia bias and discrimination based on religion, race, sexual orientation or gender identity or expression.
Title
Establishes an educational program related to the prevention of anti-Semitism, Islamophobia bias and discrimination based on religion, race, sexual orientation or gender identity or expression.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Stern [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Assembly | print number 9599b |
2020-07-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | print number 9599a |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07198 (Same As) 2020-06-24 - PRINT NUMBER 7198C