NY A09597 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - substituted by s8658
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - substituted by s8658
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the submission date for a report relating to volunteer firefighter recruitment and retention and to the effectiveness of certain provisions relating thereto.
Title
Relates to the submission date for a report relating to volunteer firefighter recruitment and retention and to the effectiveness of certain provisions relating thereto.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | substituted by s8658 |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.630 |
2022-05-03 | Assembly | reported |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S08658 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.335