NY A09590 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-10 - approval memo.23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-10 - approval memo.23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the division of veterans' services to develop a searchable database of veterans memorials located within the state, to include information regarding the location of a memorial and who or what veteran or battle the memorial is honoring.
Title
Directs the division of veterans' services to develop a searchable database of veterans memorials located within the state, to include information regarding the location of a memorial and who or what veteran or battle the memorial is honoring.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-10 | Assembly | approval memo.23 |
2022-11-10 | Assembly | signed chap.588 |
2022-11-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-25 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1453 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8729 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-03-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.510 |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | reported |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
Same As/Similar To
S08729 (Same As) 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9590