NY A09590 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - substituted by s6545a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-10 - substituted by s6545a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the issuance of certificates of insurance and requires the issuance of a certificate of insurance as a summary or evidence of property or casualty insurance.
Title
Relates to the issuance of certificates of insurance and requires the issuance of a certificate of insurance as a summary or evidence of property or casualty insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Assembly | substituted by s6545a |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.97 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.97 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-09 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S06545 (Same As) 2014-12-30 - DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR