NY A09576 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-8)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s9100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s9100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the drug take back act requiring certain manufacturers to operate a drug take back program to accept and dispose of covered drugs; provides that for any city with a population of one hundred twenty-five thousand or more as of the last decennial census, the commissioner of health shall establish by regulation a distribution plan that ensures that on-site collection receptacle or dropbox placement shall be reasonably accessible to all residents.
Title
Enacts the drug take back act requiring certain manufacturers to operate a drug take back program to accept and dispose of covered drugs; provides that for any city with a population of one hundred twenty-five thousand or more as of the last decennial census, the commissioner of health shall establish by regulation a distribution plan that ensures that on-site collection receptacle or dropbox placement shall be reasonably accessible to all residents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s9100 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.450 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-17 | Assembly | print number 9576b |
2018-06-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | print number 9576a |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2018-01-23 | Assembly | referred to health |