NY A09567 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-17 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the independent developmental disability ombudsman program for the purpose of assisting individuals with developmental disabilities to ensure their access to services and preservation of their rights.
Title
Establishes the independent developmental disability ombudsman program for the purpose of assisting individuals with developmental disabilities to ensure their access to services and preservation of their rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly People With Disabilities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly People With Disabilities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | print number 9567a |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to people with disabilities |
2022-03-16 | Assembly | referred to people with disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S08326 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - referred to ways and means