NY A09534 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends occupancy tax in the city of White Plains to 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends occupancy tax in the city of White Plains to 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 116 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-05-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1121
2018-05-07SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2018-05-07Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-05-07Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-07Assemblyhome rule request
2018-04-19Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.759
2018-04-18Assemblyreported
2018-01-19Assemblyreferred to ways and means

Same As/Similar To

S07417 (Same As) 2018-01-17 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback