NY A09527 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-07 - signed chap.365
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows an individual to substitute correspondence work for classroom work when applying for an insurance agent license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows an individual to substitute correspondence work for classroom work when applying for an insurance agent license.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-07Senatesigned chap.365
2018-11-26Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.1052
2018-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7634A
2018-06-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-05Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-05Assemblypassed assembly
2018-05-31Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.1013
2018-05-30Assemblyreported
2018-04-26Assemblyprint number 9527a
2018-04-26Assemblyamend and recommit to insurance
2018-01-19Assemblyreferred to insurance

Same As/Similar To

S07634 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9527A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09527&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09527&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09527
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09527&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09527A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09527&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09527&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A9527#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback