NY A09520 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes obstetric hemorrhage protocols.
Title
Establishes obstetric hemorrhage protocols.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.75 |
2020-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-02-25 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-02-25 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-02-25 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.409 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | substituted for a9520 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | referred to health |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.97 |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | substituted by s7173 |
2020-02-20 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.409 |
2020-02-11 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07173 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.75