NY A09502 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - signed chap.52
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - signed chap.52
Summary
Makes appropriations for the support of government - State Debt Service Budget.
Title
Makes appropriations for the support of government - State Debt Service Budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 107 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | signed chap.52 |
2018-04-02 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-03-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.726 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7502 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.17 |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.17 |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07502 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9502