NY A09480 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - signed chap.44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - signed chap.44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the requirement of an undertaking by a surrogate or a county judge.
Title
Repeals the requirement of an undertaking by a surrogate or a county judge.
Sponsors
Asm. Dan Quart [D] | Asm. Helene Weinstein [D] | Asm. Charles Lavine [D] | Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Kenneth Zebrowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Senate | signed chap.44 |
2012-05-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-05-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.628 |
2012-05-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6659 |
2012-04-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2012-04-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-04-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-04-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.470 |
2012-04-18 | Assembly | reported |
2012-03-06 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06659 (Same As) 2012-05-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9480