NY A09468 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - print number 9468a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-19 - print number 9468a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the use of airway clearance devices in schools; provides for training for school employees.
Title
Provides for the use of airway clearance devices in schools; provides for training for school employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Assembly | print number 9468a |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | held for consideration in education |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S08536 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - referred to education