NY A09464 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - signed chap.373
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - signed chap.373
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to applications to modify orders of child support in the family court.
Title
Relates to applications to modify orders of child support in the family court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | Senate | signed chap.373 |
2014-09-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1355 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7535 |
2014-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.737 |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-01 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07535 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9464