NY A09441 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-03 - substituted by s8692a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the use of the Madison and Oneida county correctional facilities; relates to county-tribal detention agreements between the Oneida Indian Nation and Madison county and between the Oneida Indian Nation and Oneida county.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the use of the Madison and Oneida county correctional facilities; relates to county-tribal detention agreements between the Oneida Indian Nation and Madison county and between the Oneida Indian Nation and Oneida county.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Correction Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-03Assemblysubstituted by s8692a
2024-06-03Assemblyrules report cal.347
2024-06-03Assemblyreported
2024-05-30Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-05-28Assemblyprint number 9441a
2024-05-28Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to correction
2024-03-14Assemblyreferred to correction

Same As/Similar To

S08692 (Same As) 2024-07-30 - SIGNED CHAP.213

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback