NY A09421 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-29 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to covered lives assessments in the Rochester region.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to covered lives assessments in the Rochester region.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 117 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-29Senatetabled
2014-12-29Senatevetoed memo.574
2014-12-17Assemblydelivered to governor
2014-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2014-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2014-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1682
2014-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S7800
2014-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2014-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2014-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2014-06-17Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.368
2014-06-17Assemblyrules report cal.368
2014-06-17Assemblyreported
2014-06-16Assemblyreported referred to rules
2014-05-28Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2014-05-19Assemblyprint number 9421a
2014-05-19Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2014-04-29Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S07800 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9421A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback