NY A09405 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - signed chap.351
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - signed chap.351
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the powers and duties of fire district commissioners.
Title
Relates to the powers and duties of fire district commissioners.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Senate | signed chap.351 |
2016-09-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.404 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7014 |
2016-03-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.447 |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | reported |
2016-03-01 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07014 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9405