NY A09394 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - amended on third reading 9394a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - amended on third reading 9394a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits off-track betting corporation vehicles from being used as take-home vehicles by board members, officers, employees, contractors, subcontractors, consultants, or agents of such corporation or by certain family members of such individuals; provides an exception therefor.
Title
Prohibits off-track betting corporation vehicles from being used as take-home vehicles by board members, officers, employees, contractors, subcontractors, consultants, or agents of such corporation or by certain family members of such individuals; provides an exception therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Racing And Wagering Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9394a |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.226 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.226 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-02-23 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S07854 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - referred to racing and wagering