NY A09394 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - signed chap.500
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - signed chap.500
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the tax rate reduction under the NY state real estate transfer tax and the NYC real property transfer tax for conveyances of real property to existing real estate investment funds.
Title
Extends the tax rate reduction under the NY state real estate transfer tax and the NYC real property transfer tax for conveyances of real property to existing real estate investment funds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | signed chap.500 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-10 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1220 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7208 |
2014-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.724 |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported |
2014-04-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07208 (Same As) 2014-06-10 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9394