NY A09390 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - print number 9390b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - print number 9390b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits recording of the entrance or exit of a school ground or the entrance or exit to a property that contains school grounds within its boundaries.
Title
Prohibits recording of the entrance or exit of a school ground or the entrance or exit to a property that contains school grounds within its boundaries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Assembly | print number 9390b |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | print number 9390a |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2024-03-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S08422 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - referred to codes