NY A09387 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-29 - print number 9387b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-29 - print number 9387b
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a tax credit for the purchase and installation of a security camera system on residential, commercial and non-profit owned properties.
Title
Establishes a tax credit for the purchase and installation of a security camera system on residential, commercial and non-profit owned properties.
Sponsors
Asm. Dov Hikind [D] | Asm. Marcos Crespo [D] | Asm. Earlene Hooper [D] | Asm. Michael Blake [D] |
Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Peter Abbate [D] | Asm. James Brennan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-29 | Assembly | print number 9387b |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | print number 9387a |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06937 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - referred to ways and means