NY A09380 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.287
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.287
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a voluntary surveillance access database where residential homeowners and business owners may elect to have information and/or images obtained from their closed-circuit television or other electronic surveillance systems made available to law enforcement agencies.
Title
Establishes a voluntary surveillance access database where residential homeowners and business owners may elect to have information and/or images obtained from their closed-circuit television or other electronic surveillance systems made available to law enforcement agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Senate | signed chap.287 |
2012-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-21 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1449 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7775 |
2012-06-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.478 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.478 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reference changed to codes |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | print number 9380b |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | print number 9380a |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2012-02-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06796 (Same As) 2012-06-13 - referred to governmental operations
S07775 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9380B
S07775 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9380B