NY A09376 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - signed chap.303
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - signed chap.303
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain parcels of land from the provisions of law which generally restrict manufacturers, wholesalers and retailers from sharing an interest in a liquor license.
Title
Exempts certain parcels of land from the provisions of law which generally restrict manufacturers, wholesalers and retailers from sharing an interest in a liquor license.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-09 | Senate | signed chap.303 |
2016-08-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1408 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6816A |
2016-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.235 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.235 |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | print number 9376a |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S06816 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9376A