NY A09375 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-21 - signed chap.608
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-21 - signed chap.608
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the county of Orleans to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Ryan Flaherty, a deputy sheriff employed by such county.
Title
Authorizes the county of Orleans to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Ryan Flaherty, a deputy sheriff employed by such county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-21 | Assembly | signed chap.608 |
2022-11-21 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2022-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1640 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S3723A |
2022-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | home rule request |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.420 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.420 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-02-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S03723 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9375