NY A09374 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires facilities offering dialysis services to have an alternate generated power source for use during a general power outage or disaster emergency.
Title
Requires facilities offering dialysis services to have an alternate generated power source for use during a general power outage or disaster emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.301 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.301 |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | print number 9374a |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2014-04-23 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07024 (Same As) 2014-04-16 - REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS