NY A09367 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-05 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires training of fire officers in a city with a population of one million or more: requires field training and classroom instruction on the fire and building codes and any relevant local ordinances of such city by July 1, 2014.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires training of fire officers in a city with a population of one million or more: requires field training and classroom instruction on the fire and building codes and any relevant local ordinances of such city by July 1, 2014.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 117 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-05Senatetabled
2012-10-03Senatevetoed memo.159
2012-09-21Assemblydelivered to governor
2012-06-21SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-21SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2012-06-21Senate3RD READING CAL.689
2012-06-21SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6436
2012-06-20SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2012-06-20Assemblydelivered to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyhome rule request
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.477
2012-06-20Assemblyrules report cal.477
2012-06-20Assemblyreported
2012-06-20Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-18Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2012-05-10Assemblyprint number 9367a
2012-05-10Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental employees
2012-02-24Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S06436 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9367A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback