NY A09365 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - substituted by s8129
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-31 - substituted by s8129
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions providing for the sale of municipal obligations by the county of Erie.
Title
Extends provisions providing for the sale of municipal obligations by the county of Erie.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-31 | Assembly | substituted by s8129 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | rules report cal.472 |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-02-23 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08129 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.329