NY A09357 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-7)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-24 - substituted by s6800
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-24 - substituted by s6800
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the use of epinephrine auto-injector devices.
Title
Relates to the use of epinephrine auto-injector devices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-24 | Assembly | substituted by s6800 |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.696 |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | reported |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06800 (Same As) 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.373