NY A09356 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-11 - REFERRED TO HEALTH
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a New York state physical fitness and activity education campaign.
Title
Establishes a New York state physical fitness and activity education campaign.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.488 |
2016-04-05 | Assembly | reported |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | referred to health |