NY A09355 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-3)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-10 - print number 9355b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-10 - print number 9355b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing a task force on safety in school transportation.
Title
Relates to establishing a task force on safety in school transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | Assembly | print number 9355b |
2016-06-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | print number 9355a |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06687 (Same As) 2016-03-28 - PRINT NUMBER 6687A