NY A09353 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-18 - substituted by s6727b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that in any proceeding alleging a muni-meter violation, it shall be an affirmative defense that the person summoned did in fact purchase muni-meter ticket prior to or contemporaneously with the issuance of the summons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that in any proceeding alleging a muni-meter violation, it shall be an affirmative defense that the person summoned did in fact purchase muni-meter ticket prior to or contemporaneously with the issuance of the summons.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-18Assemblysubstituted by s6727b
2012-06-18Assemblyrules report cal.303
2012-06-18Assemblyreported
2012-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2012-06-05Assemblyprint number 9353c
2012-06-05Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2012-05-02Assemblyprint number 9353b
2012-05-02Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2012-05-01Assemblyreported referred to codes
2012-03-06Assemblyprint number 9353a
2012-03-06Assemblyamend and recommit to transportation
2012-02-22Assemblyreferred to transportation

Same As/Similar To

S06727 (Same As) 2012-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.486

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback