NY A09344 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - signed chap.517
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-17 - signed chap.517
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides outreach services to make certain stakeholders aware of the independent substance use disorder and mental health ombudsman program.
Title
Provides outreach services to make certain stakeholders aware of the independent substance use disorder and mental health ombudsman program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-17 | Assembly | signed chap.517 |
2022-08-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-31 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-31 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-31 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.550 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8057A |
2022-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.221 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.221 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 9344a |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to alcoholism and drug abuse |
2022-02-23 | Assembly | referred to alcoholism and drug abuse |
Same As/Similar To
S08057 (Same As) 2022-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9344A