NY A09343 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for an allowable recovery by a rental vehicle company from its renters for actual costs incurred to title, register, plate and inspect rental vehicles as determined by an annual audit conducted by the rental vehicle company.
Title
Provides for an allowable recovery by a rental vehicle company from its renters for actual costs incurred to title, register, plate and inspect rental vehicles as determined by an annual audit conducted by the rental vehicle company.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-12-16 | Assembly | vetoed memo.115 |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-02 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-02 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1924 |
2022-06-02 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8530C |
2022-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.561 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.561 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 9343b |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | print number 9343a |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2022-02-23 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S08530 (Same As) 2022-06-02 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9343B