NY A09336 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - signed chap.26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-27 - signed chap.26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits Onondaga county to collaborate with other counties with respect to operating and maintaining a foreign trade zone.
Title
Permits Onondaga county to collaborate with other counties with respect to operating and maintaining a foreign trade zone.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-27 | Senate | signed chap.26 |
2012-04-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-03-27 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-03-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-03-27 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.449 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6471 |
2012-03-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2012-03-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-03-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-03-16 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.414 |
2012-03-13 | Assembly | reported |
2012-02-16 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06471 (Same As) 2012-03-27 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9336