NY A09284 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-15 - held for consideration in governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a unicameral legislature consisting of seventy-five senators called the senate.
Title
Creates a unicameral legislature consisting of seventy-five senators called the senate.
Sponsors
Asm. Mark Johns [R] | Asm. Karl Brabenec [R] | Asm. Chad Lupinacci [R] | Asm. Jane Corwin [R] |
Asm. Raymond Walter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Assembly | held for consideration in governmental operations |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2016-02-12 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2016-02-11 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |