NY A09260 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to distribution of surcharges for off track winnings.
Title
Relates to distribution of surcharges for off track winnings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Senate | signed chap.437 |
2012-08-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1413 |
2012-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6932 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.653 |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2012-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-02-09 | Assembly | referred to racing and wagering |
Same As/Similar To
S06932 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9260