NY A09259 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - approval memo.18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - approval memo.18
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes massage therapists licensed in other jurisdictions to perform massage therapy demonstrations as part of an approved continuing education program.
Title
Authorizes massage therapists licensed in other jurisdictions to perform massage therapy demonstrations as part of an approved continuing education program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | approval memo.18 |
2014-12-17 | Senate | signed chap.498 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.702 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6712A |
2014-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.778 |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | print number 9259a |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2014-04-04 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S06712 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9259A