NY A09255 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s8344a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s8344a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the Fairmount Volunteer Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association's purpose and the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes.
Title
Relates to the Fairmount Volunteer Exempt Firemen's Benevolent Association's purpose and the use of foreign fire insurance premium taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s8344a |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.556 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | print number 9255a |
2022-04-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S08344 (Same As) 2022-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.714