NY A09236 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants retroactive tier IV membership in the New York state and local employees' retirement system to Brian Stebbins.
Title
Grants retroactive tier IV membership in the New York state and local employees' retirement system to Brian Stebbins.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | tabled |
2014-12-17 | Senate | vetoed memo.549 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-12 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-12 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-06-12 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.795 |
2014-06-12 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6936 |
2014-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.850 |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | reported |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06936 (Same As) 2014-06-12 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9236