NY A09231 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s8251
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s8251
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to eliminating the electronic death registration system fee for funeral directors and undertakers.
Title
Relates to eliminating the electronic death registration system fee for funeral directors and undertakers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | substituted by s8251 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.417 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-03-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08251 (Same As) 2022-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.185